U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Rostro et al v. Eddy County Board of County Commissioners et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Status Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 12, 2025: [Continue]
January, 2025
  • January 24, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.