U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00408
  • Case Name: Kulp Minerals LLC v. Apache Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 03, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
January, 2025
  • January 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.