U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00636
  • Case Name: Snyder Ranches, Inc. v. Oxy USA Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 16, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 03, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.