U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01159
  • Case Name: United States v. Novak
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • May 06, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
January, 2025
  • January 29, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.