U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00028
  • Case Name: SIMCOE LLC v. Petro Mex, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2025
  • February 04, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.