U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-01059
  • Case Name: Williams et al v. New Mexico State University et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extend (other)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
February, 2025
  • February 05, 2025: [Extend (other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.