U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Jones v. SRE Wellness
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 13, 2025: [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2025
  • February 22, 2025: [Compel]
  • February 08, 2025: [Supplement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.