U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00692
  • Case Name: Arroyo v. Johnson et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order to Submit Closing Document]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 19, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
February, 2025
  • February 10, 2025: [Witness List]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.