U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00974
  • Case Name: Bean, Jr. v. Avilacasas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • April 01, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2025
  • February 13, 2025: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.