U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01165
  • Case Name: Wilcox v. New Mexico Corrections Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Mail Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Jury Demand]
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
February, 2025
  • February 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.