U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00834
  • Case Name: El Porvenir Christian Camp and Retreat Center et al v. Federal Emergency Management Agency
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Objections]
  • March 14, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 14, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
February, 2025
  • February 26, 2025: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.