U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01233
  • Case Name: Roque et al v. Valdez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Service by Publication]
  • May 06, 2025: [Status Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.