U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00671
  • Case Name: Lopez v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 05, 2025: [Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 03, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.