U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00758
  • Case Name: Grewal v. The Four Winds Society, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 02, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Witness List]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 03, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 23, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2025: [Reset]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.