U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00601
  • Case Name: Burke v. Lea County Board of County Commissioners et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.