U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00189
  • Case Name: Grelle v. Office of Personnel Management et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • May 01, 2025: [Status Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.