U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01202
  • Case Name: Miller v. USAA Insurance Agency, Inc. et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Order to Submit Closing Document]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.