U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00911
  • Case Name: O'Hea v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order to Submit Closing Document]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 13, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.