U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00116
  • Case Name: Strickland v. City of Las Cruces et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Status Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.