U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00252
  • Case Name: Juarez-Columbos v. State of New Mexico et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 13, 2025: [Disclosure]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.