U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Irby et al v. Jefferson Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 09, 2025: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 01, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appendix/Supplement]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.