U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00153
  • Case Name: Leon-Herrera v. Bar-S Foods Co
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Dismiss Party]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.