U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00783
  • Case Name: Grants Patio Apartments LLC v. Amguard Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 11, 2025: [Minute Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.