U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00001
  • Case Name: Otero County Hospital Association, Inc. v. Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 14, 2025: [Counterclaim]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.