U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00245
  • Case Name: Patten v. Town of Clayton, New Mexico et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 23, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.