U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00782
  • Case Name: Hunt-Brown v. New Mexico General Services Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • May 05, 2025: [Vacate]
  • May 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • March 10, 2025: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.