U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00672
  • Case Name: Waltrip et al v. TransWood Logistics, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 17, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2025: [Certify Class]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.