U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00030
  • Case Name: Bradley v. Amazon
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 12, 2025: [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • May 07, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Affidavit]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 18, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.