U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00179
  • Case Name: Westfield Insurance Company v. Isight RPV Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 09, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Staying Discovery]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.