U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00217
  • Case Name: Yotter v. Sam's East Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • April 24, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • April 15, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 01, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 27, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Jury Demand]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.