U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01194
  • Case Name: Sanchez v. The County of Rio Arriba et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.