U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01292
  • Case Name: Fierro v. Trabaudo et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 14, 2025: [Strike]
  • May 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Brief]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Response]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Brief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response]
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Answer Brief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 21, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 20, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 20, 2025: [Quash]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Withdraw Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 10, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 10, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • March 10, 2025: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.