U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01039
  • Case Name: Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company v. Murphy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 10, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.