U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01052
  • Case Name: Franco v. Bill Davis Trucking, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 18, 2025: [Approve Consent Judgment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 10, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.