U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00897
  • Case Name: GJ Ranches LLC v. Lumberton Mutual Domestic Water Consumers Association et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 08, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 10, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.