U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00052
  • Case Name: Dehghani v. Castro
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 05, 2025: [Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 19, 2025: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.