U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01105
  • Case Name: Boyle v. Walmart Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 05, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.