U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00256
  • Case Name: Mathis v. CoreCivic of Tennessee et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 05, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 05, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Issued]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.