U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00883
  • Case Name: Armijo v. Foxworth-Galbraith Lumber Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • March 12, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 12, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.