U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00037
  • Case Name: B v. Ganjawala & Kholwad, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.