U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00211
  • Case Name: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge 794, AFL-CIO v. CAE USA Mission Solutions, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 03, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.