U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00173
  • Case Name: Kuykendall v. USAA General Indemnity Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Provisional Discovery Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.