U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01050
  • Case Name: Pacheco v. New Mexico Corrections Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 25, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.