U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01042
  • Case Name: Ford County, Kansas v. Permian Resources Corp. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Intervene]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 13, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.