U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00796
  • Case Name: Ortega v. Desert Mountain Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.