U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00761
  • Case Name: Garza v. Bray Fast Freight, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 06, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Supplement]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 20, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.