U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00236
  • Case Name: Rinchem Company, LLC v. Volume Logistics, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 05, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.