U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00978
  • Case Name: Salcido v United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.