U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00164
  • Case Name: Cormier v. Devon Energy Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 12, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.