U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00136
  • Case Name: Mundo v. Vandever et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 13, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • March 17, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 14, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.